HI SB3145 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes licensure requirements for school psychologists to be administered by the board of psychology. Amends the composition of the board to include 2 school psychologists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2020-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to CPH.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback