HI SB3142 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 10:40AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 10:40AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds for a master planned development proposed by Pueo Development, LLC. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Pueo Development, Llc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 10:40AM in conference room 423. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-17-20 10:40AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2989) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-20 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2448) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2721 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).