HI SB3133 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the air freight inspection, quarantine, and eradication service fee and charge and corresponding fund to finance inspection, quarantine, and eradication activities relating to air freight that arrives at the State's airports. Transfers plant quarantine branch employees stationed at airports from the department of agriculture to the department of transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Air Freight.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateThe committee on AEN deferred the measure.
2020-02-10SenateThe committee on TRS deferred the measure.
2020-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to AEN/TRS, WAM.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback