HI SB3129 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Health to convene a construction waste reuse and recycling working group to determine how to implement a requirement for the reuse, recycling, or donation of construction waste. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Construction Waste.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateRe-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM.
2020-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2020-02-13SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2628) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2020-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Fevella.
2020-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:15PM in conference room 224.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to AEN, CPH.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2698 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback