HI SB3117 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-15 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-15 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the emergency department homelessness assessment pilot program and medical respite pilot program to 06/30/2021. Clarifies the lapse date for encumbered resources for the pilot programs that were previously appropriated pursuant to Act 209, SLH 2018. Effective retroactively to 06/29/2019. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 633). |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments; passed Final Reading, as amended. Ayes, 25. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Deferred One Day 07-10-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 414). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1263-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-06-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 06-30-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 06-30-20 2:00PM. |
2020-06-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1124-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Say. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-13-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 497) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3189) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2373) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2525 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Subjects
Department of Human Services
Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program
Medical Respite Pilot Program ($)
Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program
Medical Respite Pilot Program ($)