HI SB3114 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Gives preference rights for an agricultural park lot and a non-agricultural park land lease to lessees who have made a significant improvement to the land that furthers commercial agricultural operations. Adds the same preferences for a non-agricultural park land lease as those for an agricultural park lot lease. Requires the department of agriculture to define "agricultural improvement" in administrative rules. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Leases.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to AGR/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 496) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3245) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2675) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:35PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2576 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to AGR/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Agricultural Park Leases
Department of Agriculture
Improvements
Non-agricultural Park Land Leases
Preferences
Qualifications
Terms
Department of Agriculture
Improvements
Non-agricultural Park Land Leases
Preferences
Qualifications
Terms