HI SB3111 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 11:30AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Defines "alternative fuel vehicle" for the purpose of annual vehicle registration surcharge fees. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Electric Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 11:30AM in conference room 423.
2020-03-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN/EEP on Wednesday, 03-18-20 11:30AM in House conference room 423.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 495) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-27SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2988) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
2020-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211.
2020-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-02-10SenateReported from TRS/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2441) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2020-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on TRS/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 1:16PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to TRS/EET, WAM.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback