HI SB3106 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOA to establish a permanent hemp program pursuant to federal law, and a corresponding special fund. Requires DOH to adopt rules for the licensing, inspection, and regulation of industrial hemp processing facilities. Reduces or repeals certain regulatory provisions of existing hemp pilot program. Establishes authorized cultivation of hemp as affirmative defense. Excludes hemp from the definition of marijuana. Requires chairperson of board of agriculture to prepare a state plan for approval of the federal Secretary of Agriculture and report on the approval process to legislature and governor. Appropriates funds. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Industrial Hemp.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2020-02-26SenateThe committee on WAM deferred the measure.
2020-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211.
2020-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
2020-02-13SenateReported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2602) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
2020-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 1:50PM in conference room 224.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to AEN/CPH, WAM/JDC.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2689 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback