HI SB3103 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the school facilities agency to be responsible for all public school development, planning, and construction, related to capital improvement projects assigned by the legislature, governor, or board of education. Places management of school impact fees with the agency. (HD2)
Title
Relating To A School Facilities Agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632). |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-10-20. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 413). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1276-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2020-06-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-06-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-06-23 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-06-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 06-23-20 1:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-06-22 | House | Re-referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 48 |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE/FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 492) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara, Moriwaki, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Riviere, L. Thielen. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3069) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2878) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-12-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2544 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to LHE/FIN, referral sheet 5