HI SB3092 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 149, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 149, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deems student interns engaging in commercial enterprises to be employees of the State of Hawaii. Allows the Department of Education to use revenue generated from commercial enterprises. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Commercial Enterprises In Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 149, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 149, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 132-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 132-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Eli, Kapela, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Eli Co-Chairs; Kapela, Okimoto. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Taniguchi, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, LoPresti, Matayoshi, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1995-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 2:45PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1233-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Clark, Quinlan, Yamane. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 429) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3141) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EDU/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2341) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU/LCA, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2124 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).