HI SB3066 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates general funds to various programs for anticipated operating shortfalls due to the limited ability for departments to transfer funds between programs.
Title
Relating To Funding Adjustments For State Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2377 (Same As) 2024-05-24 - Act 026, 05/23/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3066&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3066_.HTM |