HI SB3062 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 256, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the Life Settlements Model Act, which establishes consumer protections in life settlement transactions in which the owner of a life insurance policy transfers the death benefit for compensation that is more than the policy's cash surrender value but less than its expected death benefit. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; Life Settlements Model Act; Stranger-Originated Life Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 (S) Act 256, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
2012-07-10 (H) Act 256, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
2012-05-08 (S) Enrolled to Governor.
2012-05-02 (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720).
2012-05-01 (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831).
2012-05-01 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2012-05-01 (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2012-04-26 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12.
2012-04-26 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12.
2012-04-26 (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 17-12) as amended in (CD 1).
2012-04-26 (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 17-12).
2012-04-26 (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Choy, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2012-04-26 (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2012-04-24 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 9:15AM in conference room 016.
2012-04-20 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-12 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2012-04-18 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-12 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2012-04-17 (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-12 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2012-04-17 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
2012-04-16 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2012-04-16 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Taniguchi, Slom.
2012-04-16 (H) House conferees appointed: Herkes, Choy Co-Chairs; Tsuji, Marumoto.
2012-04-12 (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679).
2012-04-12 (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments.
2012-04-12 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 546).
2012-04-10 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2012-04-05 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12.
2012-04-05 (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1624-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2012-04-03 (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2012-04-02 (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2012-03-29 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-02-12 5:00PM in House conference room 308.
2012-03-20 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5).
2012-03-20 (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1120-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2012-03-12 (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Keith-Agaran, Souki, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey.
2012-03-09 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-12-12 2:10PM in House conference room 325.
2012-03-08 (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41
2012-03-08 (H) Pass First Reading
2012-03-06 (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 409) in amended form (SD 1).
2012-03-06 (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2012-03-01 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12.
2012-03-01 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2012-03-01 (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2444) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2012-02-22 (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Nishihara.
2012-01-31 (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-12 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2012-01-27 (S) Referred to CPN.
2012-01-27 (S) Passed First Reading.
2012-01-25 (S) Introduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback