HI SB3056 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the environmental and economic development revolving loan fund under the administration of the Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority. Allows property owners to finance qualified improvements through a non-ad valorem property assessment. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Financing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EET, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2088 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 183, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284).
Subjects
Cesspool Upgrade and Conversion
Environmental and Economic Development Financing ($)
Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority
Property Assessed Financing
Property Resilience
Environmental and Economic Development Financing ($)
Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority
Property Assessed Financing
Property Resilience
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3056&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB3056_.HTM |