HI SB3055 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a transition to silent, clean electric mopeds by prohibiting a retailer from selling or offering for sale combustion engine-powered mopeds beginning January 1, 2022. Effective January 1, 2025. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Mopeds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2020-02-14SenateReported from TRS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2706) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2020-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Wakai.
2020-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2020-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on TRS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 12:00PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-30SenateRe-Referred to TRS/CPH, JDC/WAM.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to TRS/CPH, JDC.
2020-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2741 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRN/EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback