HI SB3054 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 193, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 193, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the funding sources and authorized uses of the Hawaii film and creative industries development special fund. Makes an appropriation out of the special fund. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Film And Creative Industries Development Special Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 193, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 193, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 94-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 94-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Shimabukuro, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-22 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-22 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-22 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Holt Co-Chairs; B. Kobayashi, Okimoto. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Shimabukuro, Riviere Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1816-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1244-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-18 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-18-22 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 416) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3139) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2547) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2086 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).