HI SB3046 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to EDB, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to EDB, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a court to order the charter of a corporation forfeited and the certificate authorizing a foreign corporation to do business in the State revoked upon a felony or misdemeanor conviction of the corporation or its high managerial agent that is related to its business affairs. Repeals the requirement for findings for a court to order forfeiture of a charter or revocation of a certificate. Requires similar penalties for various partnership entities and limited liability companies and their foreign counterparts convicted of a felony or misdemeanor. Permits the winding up of the business. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Penal Liability For Business Entities.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 470) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3024) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2157 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Re-referred to EDB, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 9
Subjects
Business Entities
Cancellation
Corporations
Dissolution
Felony
High Managerial Agent
Misdemeanor
Revocation
Cancellation
Corporations
Dissolution
Felony
High Managerial Agent
Misdemeanor
Revocation