HI SB3034 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-16 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-16 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a ballot question for an amendment to the Hawaii State Constitution to provide victims of crimes with specific rights related to the criminal justice process. (SB3034 HD2)
Title
Crime Victim Rights; Marsy's Law; Constitutional Amendment (ConAm)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-16 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-16 3:45PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Gabbard. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, LoPresti Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Pouha. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 601). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1704-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-07-16 2:01PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1269-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-15-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 328) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2817) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2448) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-10-16 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2120 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2