HI SB303 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and the appropriation of funds into the rental assistance revolving fund for purposes of expanding the rental assistance program.
Title
Appropriation; State Rental Assistance Program; General Obligation Bonds ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 32) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2013-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-28-13 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-26-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1348 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Referred to HUS/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 7