HI SB3029 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum fine that may be assessed per fireworks-related violation from $2,000 to $5,000, provided that the fireworks violation does not otherwise have a specific penalty enumerated in chapter 132D, HRS.
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2733) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |