HI SB3028 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPN.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Deletes the term "enhanced" in reference to 911 services to allow funding of all 911 technologies. Amends the rate of the monthly enhanced 911 surcharge. Allows the 911 Board to employ staff, in addition to the executive director, exempt from chapters 76 and 89, HRS. Takes effect 7/1/2112. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To 911 Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPN.
2024-02-16SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2587) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/CPN.
2024-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai.
2024-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-08-24 3:03PM; CR 225.
2024-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
2024-01-26SenateReferred to GVO, WAM/CPN.
2024-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2024-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2339 (Same As) 2024-06-24 - Act 066, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback