HI SB3025 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires franchisees to disclose their non-participation in advertising campaigns of the franchisor in which discounts or promotions are offered. Prohibits franchisors from limiting or restricting the disclosures. Exempts and defines "quick service restaurants." (SB3025 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786).
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
2018-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Ihara.
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, McDermott.
2018-04-10HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778).
2018-04-10SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2018-04-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 542).
2018-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1926-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola.
2018-04-03HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-04-18 at 2:40 pm in conference room 308.
2018-04-03HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-04-18.
2018-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:30AM in House conference room 308.
2018-03-23HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
2018-03-23HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1389-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-03-21HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Mizuno.
2018-03-19HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 392) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-03-06SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2018-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2548) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2018-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-01-26SenateReferred to CPH.
2018-01-26SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2727 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to CPH, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback