HI SB3017 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1400).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1400).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the daily $10 tax on transient accommodations furnished on a complimentary or gratuitous basis includes transient accommodations furnished as part of a travel package, but does not include transient accommodations furnished as part of a tourism industry promotional or marketing activity. (SD2)
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax; Complimentary Rooms; Daily $10 Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1400). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1400). | |
2012-06-25 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-12 (Gov. Msg. No. 1253) | |
2012-06-25 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1253) | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 715). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marumoto, Rhoads, Souki voting no (3) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1823-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Jordan, Riviere, Ward. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-27-12 9:00AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-12. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-02-12 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1023-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Tokioka, Awana, Choy, Evans, Hashem, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Marumoto. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 03-12-12 9:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 395) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2799) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on on 02-23-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) Reported from TSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2045) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kouchi, Galuteria, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to TSM, WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |