HI SB3011 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 1:15PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 1:15PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to transfer TMKs (1) 9-4-012:001, (1) 9-4-012:002, and (1) 9-4-012:003 located in Kunia, Oahu to the Agribusiness Development Corporation no later than January 1, 2013. Effective January 20, 2020. (SB3011 HD2)
Title
Department of Agriculture; Agribusiness Development Corporation; Transfer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 2:10PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-12 2:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-12 2:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 757). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Dela Cruz, Chair; Solomon, Nishihara, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, Tsuji, Har Co-Chairs; Hashem, Riviere. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 541). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Marumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Luke, Ward, Wooley voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1594-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Giugni, Jordan, Marumoto; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 1:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Awana, Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1261-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1026-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to AGR. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Coffman, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 03-12-12 9:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to WLO, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 392) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2807) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-12 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Reported from WLH/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2246) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-14-12 2:50PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL will hold a public decision making on 02-09-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH will hold a public decision making on 02-09-12 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to WLH/AGL, WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |