HI SB301 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the ban on pistols with a detachable magazine with over ten round capacity to any firearm with a detachable magazine with over ten round capacity. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseReferred to JHA, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 190) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 19; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Moriwaki. Noes, 6 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Gabbard, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) with Senator Fevella voting "No".
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Gabbard, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-17-21 9:55AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01SenateRe-Referred to JDC.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback