HI SB3008 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes medicaid providers to place on the medicaid certification and recertification forms a question composed by the department of human services to determine the housing status of the individual. Allows medicaid providers to collect and release to the legislature aggregate housing status information, subject to applicable privacy laws and regulations. (SD1)
Title
Human Services; Medicaid; Homeless
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2274) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-11-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, CPH/WAM. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPH. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |