HI SB3008 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 290, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1407).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 290, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1407).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows impoverished family court plaintiffs and petitioners to serve notice by posting pleadings at the courthouse in lieu of notice by publication, subject to order of the court, demonstration of a diligent search, and mailing of the pleadings to the defendant's or respondent's closest known relative. Effective 09/01/12. (CD1)
Title
Family Court; Service By Publication, Mail, and Posting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 290, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1407). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 290, on 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1407). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 82-12). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 82-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Keith-Agaran, Jordan, Ito, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 757). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, Keith-Agaran, Jordan Co-Chairs; Ito, Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 539). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Ching voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1547-12) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1278-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Cabanilla, Herkes. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-12 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1067-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Wooley, Yamane, Pine. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 03-12-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 390). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) One Day Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2792) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2345) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |