HI SB3002 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 167, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 167, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the State Librarian to designate one or more public library employees to be notaries public. Allows designated employees to perform as notaries public in government service for fees that will be deposited into the Library Fee for Enhanced Services Special Fund. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Libraries.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 167, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 167, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 90-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 90-18). |
2018-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Cullen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 802). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Espero, K. Kahele. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 541). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1916-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1273-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-12 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Learmont, McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-12-18 2:05PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-02 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 37) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-01-18. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2525) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU/JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |