HI SB300 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a sentence of death or life imprisonment without possibility of parole upon conviction of a defendant for the murder of multiple persons. Prohibits defendants committing premeditated murder of multiple persons from asserting a defense that excludes penal responsibility due to a physical or mental disease, disorder, or defect.
Title
Capital Punishment; Murder of Multiple Persons; Physical or Mental Disease, Disorder, or Defect
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=300&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB300_.HTM |