HI SB2973 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to establish a three-year child care pilot grant program to provide grants to employers to assist in offering child care or caregiving support for their employees.
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to LBT/HHS, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1958 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on LGO/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2973&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2973_.HTM |