HI SB2956 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Re-Referred to AEN/JDC, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Re-Referred to AEN/JDC, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the importation of unroasted coffee into the State, makes it a class C felony, and imposes a fine for violation of the prohibition. Authorizes DOA to adopt rules to allow for the importation of partially roasted coffee into the State.
Title
Relating To Importation Of Unroasted Coffee Into Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/JDC, CPH/WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC/CPH. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1887 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2956&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2956_.HTM |