HI SB2955 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires rental motor vehicle lessors with more than two hundred light duty passenger vehicles, to plan for the incorporation of at least fifty per cent of zero-emission vehicles into the lessor's fleet by 2030 and report information on all vehicles in the lessor's fleet to the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. Establishes a task force to develop a plan for incorporating zero-emission vehicles into the fleets of rental motor vehicle lessors operating in Hawaii. Appropriates funds for the task force. (SB2955 HD1)
Title
Relating To Zero-emission Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from EEP/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1398-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-16 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McDermott. |
2018-03-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McDermott. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/TRN on Friday, 03-16-18 10:05AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 373) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2567) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-20-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2332) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 1:35PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, CPH. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TRE/AEN, CPH. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |