HI SB2954 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption from the GET, beginning January 1, 2023, for the sale of feminine hygiene products in the State. Effective 1/1/2023. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Feminine Hygiene Products.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2500) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-22 1:30PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:35PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |