HI SB295 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB295
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of a loaded firearm while intoxicated as a petty misdemeanor.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:20PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB295 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB785 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB785 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=295&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB295_.HTM |