HI SB2949 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a civil cause of action by a vulnerable adult for financial exploitation of a vulnerable adult. Allows attorney's fees and costs and punitive damages. Establishes degrees and classes of felonies for financial exploitation of an elderly person or disabled adult. Establishes a presumption of financial exploitation.
Title
Relating To Financial Exploitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2480) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Attorneys Fees
Civil Action
Damages
Disabled Adults
Elderly
Financial Exploitation
Kupuna Caucus
Penal Code
Presumption
Vulnerable Adults
Civil Action
Damages
Disabled Adults
Elderly
Financial Exploitation
Kupuna Caucus
Penal Code
Presumption
Vulnerable Adults