HI SB2944 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the research and technology grant program within the high technology development corporation to provide grants to qualified research and technology companies in Hawaii for eligible projects. Establishes program guidelines and eligibility criteria for research and technology companies. Requires eligible projects to foster science, technology, engineering, or mathematics education at the K-12 or university levels. Appropriates funds to the program.
Title
Relating To Research And Technology Grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 02-12-20 2:46PM in conference room 414. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2715 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2944&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2944_.HTM |