HI SB2943 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it a Class C felony to purchase, manufacture, or otherwise obtain firearm parts for the purpose of assembling a firearm with no serial number. Amends certain requirements relating to firearms registration.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-07-20 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2943&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2943_.HTM |