HI SB2943 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the transit-oriented development infrastructure improvement zone program to facilitate the development of certain areas. Authorizes the creation of transit-oriented development infrastructure improvement zone subaccounts to make grants or loans. Expands the use of the dwelling unit revolving fund to improve and increase the capacity of infrastructure facilities. Identifies the members of the Hawaii Community Development Authority authorized to exercise jurisdiction over matters affecting transit-oriented development infrastructure improvement zones. Appropriates funds for an infrastructure study and for staff to develop and manage the transit-oriented development infrastructure improvement zone program. (SB2943 HD1)
Title
Relating To Transit-oriented Development Zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HSG/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1386-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-20-18 11:05AM in conference room 423. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on HSG/TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-18. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/TRN on Thursday, 03-15-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HSG/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 371) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2897) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-18 10:45AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2425) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-13-18 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-06-18 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund
HCDA
HHFDC
Public Facilities
Study
Transit-oriented Development Infrastructure Improvement Zones
Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund
HCDA
HHFDC
Public Facilities
Study
Transit-oriented Development Infrastructure Improvement Zones