HI SB294 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB294

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes under the Hawaii Children's Trust Fund Coalition a collective impact program called the Malama Ohana Program to seek, design, and recommend transformative changes to the State's existing child welfare system. Requires the Malama Ohana Program to report to the legislature before the Regular Session of 2025. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Child Welfare Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30SenateThe committee on HHS deferred the measure.
2023-01-27SenateThe committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
2023-01-23SenateReferred to HHS, WAM.
2023-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB294 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback