HI SB294 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB294
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts civil asset forfeiture to cases involving the commission of a felony offense where the property owner has been convicted of the underlying felony offense, subject to certain circumstances. Directs any forfeiture proceeds to the general fund. Amends the allowable expenses for moneys in the criminal forfeiture fund. Amends the requirements for the attorney general to adopt rules and report on the Hawaii omnibus criminal forfeiture act. Effective 7/1/3021. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Property Forfeiture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797). |
2022-04-25 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 3:10PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 2:15PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Lee, Fevella. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 403). |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marten, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1700), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marten; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1337) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 03-16-21 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2021-02-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 4) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-08-21. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 22) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 9:30AM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB659 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB294 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 3:10PM; CR 325.
SB294 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 3:10PM; CR 325.