HI SB294 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Restricts civil asset forfeiture to cases involving the commission of a felony offense where the property owner has been convicted of the underlying felony offense, subject to certain circumstances. Directs any forfeiture proceeds to the general fund. Amends the allowable expenses for moneys in the criminal forfeiture fund. Amends the requirements for the attorney general to adopt rules and report on the Hawaii omnibus criminal forfeiture act. Effective 7/1/3021. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Property Forfeiture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2021-04-13SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-09SenateDeferred One Day 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 403).
2021-04-08HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marten, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-08HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1700), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-31HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marten; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-24HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
2021-03-24HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1337) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-12HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 03-16-21 at 2:00 PM in room 325.
2021-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-11HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 10
2021-02-09HousePass First Reading
2021-02-08HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 4) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-02-08SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-02-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-08-21.
2021-02-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-02-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 22) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 9:30AM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB659 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback