HI SB2939 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the condition that employers have a collective bargaining agreement with their employees in order for section 378-32(b), HRS, to apply.
Title
Employee Benefits; Employment Practices; Sick Leave
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-12-14 10:00AM in conference room 16. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2939&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2939_.HTM |