HI SB2937 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county to establish a procedure to ensure that an asbestos survey and any necessary abatement are performed prior to the issuance of any permit for the renovation or demolition of a residential property.
Title
Relating To Residential Property.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2115 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2937&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2937_.HTM |