HI SB2936 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Transportation to negotiate the disposition of lands under its control for aeronautical, airport-related, maritime, and maritime related operations. Repeals authorization for BLNR to negotiate the disposition of lands for aeronautical, airport-related, maritime, and maritime related operations. Takes effect 7/1/2050. Repeals 7/1/2021. (SD1)
Title
Disposition of Land; Aeronautical, Airport-related, Maritime, and Maritime Related Operations; Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WLA/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2432) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kidani, Slom. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-16 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA/TRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-16 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WLA/TRE, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2407 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to TRE/WLA, WAM.