HI SB2927 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any parking facility with more than 99 parking spaces and fewer than 1,000 spaces designate 1 per cent of the spaces for electric vehicles by 12/31/2012; requires that any parking facility with 1,000 or more spaces designate 1 per cent of the spaces for green vehicles by 12/31/2012; requires that any parking facility with more than 99 spaces equip at least one electric vehicle space with an electric vehicle charging unit and be located near the building entrance; defines green vehicle to include hybrid vehicles with a fuel economy rating of 35 miles per gallon or higher for city driving; delays the authorization to issue fines to enforce electric and green vehicle parking from 7/1/2013 to 1/1/2014. (SD1)
Title
Transportation; Green Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 35 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 314) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Hee). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from ENE/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2493) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Hooser, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/TIA deferred the measure until 02-23-10 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-10 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to ENE/TIA. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Introduced. |