HI SB2926 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Board of Dental Examiners to adopt rules to establish a regulatory structure for the regulation of dental assistants in Hawaii. (SB2926 HD2)
Title
Relating To Dentistry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 802). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Nishihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Ohno, Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Tupola. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to HHS, IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 486). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 404). |
2018-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1755-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2018-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1436-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ito, LoPresti, Ward. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on IAC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1179-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to IAC. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-14-18 8:40AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, IAC, CPC, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 366) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2584) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-20-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |