HI SB2923 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 104, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1204).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 104, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1204).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the generally applicable fine and the fine for homeowner liability under the Fireworks Control Act from $2,000 to $5,000. Effective 7/1/2022. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 104, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1204). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 104, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1204). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 176-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 176-22). |
2022-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Todd, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Kidani, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Todd Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 875). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1869-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 2:45PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1223-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2022-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 385). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3054) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2522) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |