HI SB2922 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendments to the Constitution of the State of Hawaii to authorize the Legislature to establish, as provided by law, a surcharge on investment real property to support public education. (SB2922 HD1)
Title
Proposing Amendments To Articles Viii And X Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Authorize The Legislature To Establish A Surcharge To Increase Funding For Public Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 826). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 795). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Deferred until 04-23-18. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-23-18. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Discharged: Senator Kidani discharged as Chair. Senator Taniguchi discharged as Co-Chair. Senator Espero discharged as Conferee. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 603). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Evans, Holt, Kobayashi, McDermott, Nakamura, Onishi, Takumi, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1887-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, McKelvey, Ohno, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Learmont, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 3:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-04-02 | House | Re-referred to EDN, referral sheet 50 |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 363) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2754) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2071) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 3:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU/ETT/JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |