HI SB2920 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Re-Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Re-Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the appropriate county land use decision-making authority to determine district boundary amendments involving land areas over fifteen acres but less than or equal to fifty acres if the county has adopted an ordinance that meets certain requirements.
Title
Relating To District Boundary Amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1840 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - The committee(s) on WTL/GVO deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2920&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2920_.HTM |