HI SB2920 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on EDU/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-08-18 2:15PM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on EDU/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-08-18 2:15PM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education to set a standard for retention of student records of not less than 100 years. Allows the Department of Education to partner with the Hawaii Correctional Industries Program to establish a three-year student records modernization pilot project.
Title
Relating To Records Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-08-18 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU/PSM, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1628 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-07-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Education
Hawaii Correctional Industries Program
Pilot Project
Retention and Storage
Student Records
Department of Education
Hawaii Correctional Industries Program
Pilot Project
Retention and Storage
Student Records
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2920&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2920_.HTM |