HI SB2913 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 2:05PM; Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 2:05PM; Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a new regulatory framework for the sale of travel insurance in the State. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Travel Insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 2:05PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 2:05PM; CR 224. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 2:05PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 684). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; DeCoite, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Awa. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Sayama, Lamosao Co-Chairs; Hussey-Burdick, Alcos. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 679). |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1802-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-21 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2). |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1258-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-18 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Gates, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen. |
2024-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-18-24 2:05PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos excused (1). |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1075-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Kong, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica, Lamosao. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 03-12-24 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to TOU, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 224) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3044) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 10:31AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2596) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1990 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Kitagawa excused (2).